Alphonso v. Esfeller Oil Field Constructions, Inc.

Plaintiff: Tommy Alphonso
Defendant: Esfeller Oil Field Constructions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv00529
Filed: July 26, 2007
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2009 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 87 Motion for New Trial; denying 87 Motion to Alter Judgment as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/6/09. (cmj)
April 2, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Tommy Alphonso against Esfeller Oil Field Constructions, Inc. in the total amount of $508,642.68 as set out in detail in the court's previous order 85 . Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/2/09. (cmj)
March 24, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: damages in favor of plaintiff as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/24/09. (cmj)
February 20, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court Order. The court finds that defendant was negligent in the operation of the forklift causing the accident made the basis of this litigation. The court will address the appropriate damages to which plaintiff is entitled by separate order. The parti es are to submit briefs with specific citations to the evidence on the issue as follows: Plaintiff's brief due 2/27/09 and Defendant's brief due 3/6/09. ( Brief due by 2/27/2009, Replies due by 3/6/2009.). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/20/09. (cmj)
January 8, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court Order entered re: telephone call from counsel for the parties requesting the Court resolve a dispute arising during a deposition. The Court reminded counsel that they were conducting discovery outside the discovery period ordered by the Court and were doing so on their own and without the benefit of the Courts assistance with disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 1/9/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alphonso v. Esfeller Oil Field Constructions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Alphonso
Represented By: Alaraby Jane Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esfeller Oil Field Constructions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?