Crow v. Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corp.

Plaintiff: Phillip Crow
Defendant: Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corp.
Case Number: 1:2007cv00740
Filed: October 15, 2007
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:0688 Marine-Jones Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Phillip Crow against Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corp.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/2/09. (cmj)
May 5, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 55 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 69 Motion to Strike as set out in order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/4/09. (cmj)
April 22, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/22/09. (cmj)
April 21, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 56 Motion to Amend Complaint as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/21/09. (cmj)
March 5, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Setting Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 4/2/2009 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady. See other deadlines as set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/5/09. (cmj)
February 18, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 Motion to Amend judgment. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/18/09. (cmj)
February 4, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 44 Motion for Reconsideration of District Judge Order as set out in order. The trial is continued to June 2009 term with jury selection to be held June 2, 2009 and the pretrial conference is to be held May 14, 2009 at 12:30. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/4/09. (cmj)
January 22, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/22/09. (cmj)
January 15, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to defendant's counterclaim for recoupment.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/14/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crow v. Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Crow
Represented By: Dennis Michael O'Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?