Parsons & Whittemore Enterprises Corporation v. Cello Energy, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Parsons & Whittemore Enterprises Corporation
Defendant: Cello Energy, LLC, Boykin Trust, LLC and Biofuels Operating Co., LLC
Case Number: 1:2007cv00743
Filed: October 16, 2007
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2012 697 Opinion or Order of the Court CHARGING ORDER, granting 695 Motion for Charging Order Against Defendant Allen W. Boykin with respect to any membership interest in Verde Energy Consulting LLC as set out in order. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/5/2012. (copy to Finance) (mab)
September 29, 2010 599 Opinion or Order of the Court Order, denying 573 MOTION to alter the jury verdict filed by Parsons & Whittemore Enterprises Corporation; and directing plaintiff to advise the court within 14 days of entry of this order if it intends to pursue any of the counts for equitable relief that remain in the 158 amended complaint. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 09/29/2010. (mab)
September 27, 2010 598 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED as follows: i) That JUDGMENT is entered in favor of Parsons & Whittemore Enterprises Corporation on its breach of contract claim against Cello Energy, LLC and Boykin Trust, LLC in the amount of � 36;2,827,123.00; ii) That JUDGMENT is entered in favor of Parsons & Whittemore Enterprises Corporation on its fraud claim against Cello Energy, LLC, Boykin Trust, LLC, Jack W. Boykin, and Allen Boykin in the amount of $104,437.50; iii) That JUDG MENT is entered in favor of Parsons & WhittemoreEnterprises Corporation on its claim for punitive damages against Cello Energy,LLC, Boykin Trust, LLC, Jack W. Boykin, and Allen Boykin jointly andseverally in the amount of $7,500,000.00.; iv) Tha t JUDGMENT is entered in favor of Cello Energy, LLC, Boykin Trust, LLC, Jack W. Boykin, and Allen Boykin as to Counts Four, Five, and Six (as to the Option Agreement and the Letter Agreement), and Count Nine of Parsons & Whittemore Enterprises Corpor ation's Amended Complaint (Doc. 158 ); and v) That JUDGMENT is entered in favor of Parsons & Whittemore Enterprises Corporation as to Counts One (as to the Nondisclosure Agreement), Two, Three, Four, and Six of the Boykin Defendants' Amended Counterclaim (Doc. 178 ). Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 09/27/2010. (mab)
September 22, 2010 596 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT is hereby entered in favor of BioFuels Operating Company, LLC, Khosla Ventures, LLC, Red Sky, LP and Khosla Ventures II, LP (the "Khosla Ventures Defendants") as to Counts One, Two, Four, and Seven of Parsons & Whittemore Enterprises Corporation's ("P&W") Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 09/22/2010. (mab)
May 7, 2009 417 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 380 Motion for restitution, with leave granted to refile as set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 05/07/2009. (mab)
February 7, 2009 375 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting in part and denying in part defendants' 179 & 255 Renewed Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 02/07/2009. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parsons & Whittemore Enterprises Corporation v. Cello Energy, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parsons & Whittemore Enterprises Corporation
Represented By: W. Joseph McCorkle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cello Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boykin Trust, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biofuels Operating Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?