New Hampshire Insurance Company v. Blue Water Off Shore, LLC

Plaintiff: New Hampshire Insurance Company
Defendant: Blue Water Off Shore, LLC
Case Number: 1:2007cv00754
Filed: October 22, 2007
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2009 262 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 254 Motion to Retax. Costs are taxed against the plaintiff in the amount of $7,322.07. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 8/28/09. Copies to parties. (mpp)
July 20, 2009 252 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 246 Motion to Stay. New Hampshire's motion to dispense with the posting of a supersedeas bond is denied, and its alternate motion to approve a supersedeas bond in the amount of $2,187,500 is granted. The stay pending appeal will take effect upon posting of the approved bond. The Motion to Stay execution pending resolution of its motion for new trial is denied as moot. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 7/20/09. (tgw)
May 4, 2009 229 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying all requests regarding ambiguity (as set out). Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 5/4/09. (tgw)
April 30, 2009 218 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 174 Motion in Limine to exclude reference to Sea Tow lawsuit. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 4/30/09. (tgw)
April 29, 2009 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 178 Motion in Limine to exclude evidence of incorrect policy form. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 4/29/09. (tgw)
April 27, 2009 205 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 169 Motion in Limine to exclude evidence of whether Blue Water or its alleged agent asked for a copy of the insurance policy. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 4/27/09. (tgw)
March 23, 2009 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 107 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 110 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 128 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 138 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 140 Motion to Strike; denying 142 Motion to Strike; granting 144 Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Motion to Strike; granting 145 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 3/20/09. (tgw)
October 28, 2008 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 83 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 10/28/08. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Hampshire Insurance Company v. Blue Water Off Shore, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Hampshire Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael David Strasavich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Water Off Shore, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?