Servicio Marina Superior, LLC v. Matrix International LTD et al

Plaintiff: Servicio Marina Superior, LLC
Defendant: Matrix International LTD and Alter Trading Corporation
Case Number: 1:2007cv00770
Filed: October 29, 2007
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 65 Motion for Disbursement of Funds as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/12/09. (cmj)
April 2, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 62 Motion to Stay as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/2/09. (cmj)
March 31, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 58 Motion to Stay as set out in order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/31/09. (cmj)
March 17, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 53 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/17/09. (cmj)
December 18, 2008 52 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in accordance with the Order issued on this date, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that JUDGMENT is entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Matrix as follows: 1) for the September Voyage, the amount due to Plaintiff and t o be paid by Matrix, is $78,647.30; 2) for the October Voyage, the amount due to Plaintiff and to be paid by Matrix is $200,964.33; and 3) for the equipment retrieval, the amount due to Plaintiff and to be paid by Matrix is $14,447. Thus, the Court finds that Plaintiff is entitled to recover the total sum of $294,058.63 from Matrix. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/18/08. (mca)
October 14, 2008 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot 38 Motion to Strike. This matter will proceed to trial as scheduled on 10/20/08 at 9:00 am. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/14/08. (srr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Servicio Marina Superior, LLC v. Matrix International LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Servicio Marina Superior, LLC
Represented By: J. Marshall Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matrix International LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alter Trading Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?