Caribbean I Owner's Association, Inc. v. Great American Insurance Company of New York et al

Plaintiff: Caribbean I Owner's Association, Inc.
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company of New York and XL Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2007cv00829
Filed: November 28, 2007
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2009 234 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 225 Motion to Retax as set out. Plaintiff's costs are re-taxed such that Plaintiff is entitled to recover a total award of $12,732.98. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/10/09. (cmj)
June 12, 2009 226 Opinion or Order of the Court Order for Plaintiff to submit a one-page Revised Summary of Expenses as a supplement to its pending Bill of Costs. ( Plaintiff's Response due by 6/19/2009). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/12/09. (cmj)
May 13, 2009 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 214 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/12/09. (cmj)
April 23, 2009 213 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Caribbean I Owner's Association, Inc. against Great American Insurance Company of New York in the amount of $1,510,000.00 plus costs of court. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/22/09. (cmj)
March 25, 2009 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 184 Motion to Quash as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 3/24/09. (cmj)
March 24, 2009 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 135 Motion to exclude ; Carry to Trial 155 Motion in Limine; Carry to Trial 157 Motion in Limine; denying 158 Motion in Limine; denying 159 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/24/09. (cmj)
February 26, 2009 171 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting joint motion to continue trial. Daubert Hearing reset for 3/23/2009 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Judge Kristi K. DuBose., Jury Selection reset for 3/31/2009 08:45 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Judge Kristi K. DuBose., Jury Trial reset for 3/31/2009 as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/26/09. (cmj)
February 20, 2009 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 101 Motion to Quash the Deposition of Vincent H. Smith; DENYING 102 Motion to Quash the Deposition of Ralf Leistikow, as further set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/20/09. (clr)
February 12, 2009 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 115 Defendant Great American Insurance Company of New York's Motion for Summary Judgment as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/12/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caribbean I Owner's Association, Inc. v. Great American Insurance Company of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caribbean I Owner's Association, Inc.
Represented By: David F. Daniell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?