Ripps v. Powers

Case Number: 1:2007cv00832
Filed: November 30, 2007
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2011 170 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Gordon Ripps against D. Leon Powers in the amount of $731,712 plus 6% prejudgment interest through the date of judgment plus costs in the amount of $2,783.50 & Rule 11 sanctions in the amount of $6,404.51. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/22/2011. (tot)
June 10, 2011 169 Opinion or Order of the Court Order, awarding attorneys fees and expenses in the amount of $6,404.51 (Six Thousand Four Hundred Four and 51/100 Dollars) as a Rule 11 sanction. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/10/2011. (copy to deft) (mab)
September 10, 2010 136 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: Jury Trial held on 9/8 & 9/9/10. Plf's 130 Oral MOTION to Strike Dft's Reference to Plf's Attny's Role in this Case was GRANTED. Plf's 131 Oral MOTION for Jury Instruction Regarding Dft's Cross-Examinatio n Testimony was GRANTED. Plf's 132 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law was DENIED. Plf's 133 MOTION to Remove the Rescission Instruction from the Jury Charge was GRANTED. Jury verdict was entered in favor of Plf Ripps against Dft Powers in the amount of $731,712.00. Post trial motions should be filed NLT 9/16/2010. Any responses to be filed NLT 9/23/2010. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/10/10. (copy mailed to Dft on 9/10/10) (tot)
August 31, 2010 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: in-camera hrg held on 8/31/10 prior to the jury selection. Plf's 121 Motion in Limine was DENIED as to any reference to the oral agreement, but GRANTED as to the substance of the oral agreement or whether it had any force & effect a t any time beyond when it was first entered into; Plf's 122 Motion in Limine was deemed MOOT as set out; Dft's 127 Motion for Leave to Call Xavier Hartman as a Character Witness was DENIED as inadmissible. Plf's 123 Motion in Limine was deemed MOOT as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/31/10. (copy mailed to Dft on 8/31/10) (tot)
August 24, 2010 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Dft's 112 Motion to Add Harriet Powers as a Witness as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/24/10. (copy mailed to Dft on 8/25/10) (tot)
July 28, 2010 100 Opinion or Order of the Court Order DENYING Dft's 96 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for Sanctions & GRANTING Plf's 99 MOTION to Strike as set out. Dft's 97 Proposed Pretrial Order is STRICKEN, & the parties are to provide each other w/their proposed revisions for the pretrial order & to file a Joint Pretrial Document by 8/2/2010. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/28/10. (copy mailed to Dft on 7/28/10) (tot)
December 31, 2008 77 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that this action is DISMISSED W/PREJUDICE in accordance w/the court's order this date granted dft's motion for summary judgment on plf's complaint, & also granting plf's motion for summary judgment on dft's counterclaim. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/31/08. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ripps v. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?