J&M Associates, Inc. v. Callahan et al

Case Number: 1:2007cv00883
Filed: December 21, 2007
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2011 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 254 motion to amend motion to set aside default judgment, and denying 247 motion to set aside default judgment. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/15/2011. (copy to deft Romero) (mab)
August 31, 2011 243 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered in favor of J&M Associates, Inc. against Frederick Romero and Michael Mangawang for compensatory damages, plus interest, in the amount of $1,710,201.70. Plaintiff's motion for punitive damages is DENIED wi thout prejudice. If it chooses, J&M may request an evidentiary hearing on the matter pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 55(b)(2) no later than September 14, 2011. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/31/2011. (copy to defts Romero and Mangawang at addresses listed in Doc. 236 ) (mab)
November 12, 2010 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendant's 159 Motion for Summary Judgment: GRANTED as to Count One and Count Four, and GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as to Count Two, Count Three, Count Five and Count Six; and finding as moot plaintiff's 209 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/12/2010. (mab)
March 1, 2010 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 130 Motion to Quash Third-Party Subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 3/1/2010. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&M Associates, Inc. v. Callahan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?