Autrey v. Morning Star Baptist Church et al

Case Number: 1:2007cv00895
Filed: December 28, 2007
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 41 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Tyres Frai' Aunt Autrey, Objections to R&R due by 7/10/2009Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 6/25/09. (Clerk mailed Appellant a copy) (jal)
June 9, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 36 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, and granting Defendants' 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment in its entirety. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 06/09/2009. (copy to pltf 6/9/09) (mab)
March 11, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, recommending that Defendants' 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment be granted. Objections to R&R due by 3/25/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 3/11/2009. (copy to pltf) (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Autrey v. Morning Star Baptist Church et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?