Taylor et al v. WAL-MART STORES, INC et al

Plaintiff: Doug Taylor and Tonya Taylor
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES, INC and Strong Built, Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2008cv00188
Filed: April 10, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 Motion to Stay deadlines set forth in the Rule 16(b) scheduling order. All deadlines set forth in the Rule 16(b) scheduling order (Doc. 18), as amended (Doc. 42), which REMAIN PENDING ARE STAYED. In other words, because the dead line for filing amendments to pleadings and joining parties (Doc. 18, at 4) has long since passed, that deadline is NOT stayed. However, all other deadlines (see Docs. 18 & 42) are STAYED pending resolution of the defendant's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/27/09. (cmj)
March 20, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Motion to Stay as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/20/09. (cmj)
February 6, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Motion to Amend Magistrate Judge Order; denying 37 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order; denying 38 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 2/6/09. (cmj)
January 28, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 32 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by WAL-MART STORES, INC, ( Responses due by 2/9/2009). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/28/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor et al v. WAL-MART STORES, INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Taylor
Represented By: John W. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Taylor
Represented By: John W. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES, INC
Represented By: Chad Marchand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strong Built, Incorporated
Represented By: Chad Marchand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?