Washington Mutual Bank v. Prosch, et al

Plaintiff: Washington Mutual Bank
Defendant: Gerald Lloyd Prosch and Guarantee Title Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2008cv00204
Filed: April 18, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2011 72 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that judgment is entered in favor of plaintiff, Chicago Title Insuarance Company and against defendant, Gerald Lloyd Prosch in the amount of $97,372.14. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/25/2011. (mab)
January 26, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER, Plf's 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, & judgment will be entered against Dft Prosch & in favor of Plf in the amount of $84,975.95, plus interest, fees & costs. Plf is to file an accounting of the interest, fees & costs as set out on or before 2/9/2011. Dft's response due on or before 2/16/2011. Any reply to response will be due on or before 2/23/2011. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/26/2011. (tot)
August 27, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER, Plf Chicago Title Insurance Company's 50 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as set out. Judgment will be entered against Dft Prosch & in favor of Plf Chicago Title Insurance Company in the amount of $84,97 5.95 plus interest, fees & costs. Plf is to file an accounting of interest, fees & costs on or before 9/11/09 as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/27/09. (tot) (VACATED/SET ASIDE ON 1/5/10 - SEE DOC. 62 ) Modified on 1/6/2010 (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington Mutual Bank v. Prosch, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington Mutual Bank
Represented By: John Garland Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Lloyd Prosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guarantee Title Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?