The Northern Assurance Company of America v. Bayside Marine Construction, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: The Northern Assurance Company of America
Defendant: Bayside Marine Construction, Inc. and Arthur R. Sulzer Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv00222
Filed: April 30, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Insurance Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 45 MOTION to Compel filed by The Northern Assurance Company of America. The Court DIRECTS Defendant BMC to provide complete responses to Plaintiffs Interrogatories and Request for the Production of Documents by February 13, 2009. D efendant is further directed to provide its initial disclosures by February 13, 2009, to the extent that it has not already done so. Additionally, Defendant BMC and its counsel are ORDERED to show cause, on or before February 13, 2009, why this Court should not impose sanctions. ( Show Cause Response due by 2/13/2009.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/28/09. (cmj)
January 21, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 19 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike. As set out, the Court finds that Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss BMCs unjust enrichment counterclaim is GRANTED such that Count Three of BMCs counterclaim is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. More over, the Court finds while that Plaintiffs motion to strike BMCs demand for attorneys fees is DENIED, Plaintiffs motion to dismiss BMCs demand for attorneys fees is due to be, and hereby is, GRANTED.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/20/09. (cmj)
November 20, 2008 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 28 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 22 Amended Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/19/08. (copy of order mailed to Arthur Sulzer Associates at three addresses listed in order) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Northern Assurance Company of America v. Bayside Marine Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Northern Assurance Company of America
Represented By: Arthur Grady Williams, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayside Marine Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur R. Sulzer Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?