Weller v. Finger

Plaintiff: Thomas C. Weller, Jr.
Defendant: Van R. Finger
Case Number: 1:2008cv00240
Filed: May 6, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Assault Libel & Slander Office
County: Baldwin
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2010 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plf's 195 Motion to Release Funds, & the Clerk is to disburse the $385,311.33 deposited w/the court, plus any interest accrued, to Plf's counsel as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/20/10. (tot)
June 15, 2010 193 Opinion or Order of the Court Order, Plf is entitled to an award of attny's fees in the amount of $359,667.10 & costs in the total amount of $25,644.23 as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/15/10. (tot)
April 5, 2010 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Dft's 183 Rule 58(e) Motion for Order that Pending Request for Attorney's Fees Have Same Effect as Rule 59 Motion Upon Time for Appeal & GRANTING Dft's 182 Motion for Reconsideration of Order Releasing Funds, Etc. [ 181] Order releasing funds deposited w/the court is AMENDED to permit the release of only $100,000.00 of those funds, w/accrued interest, to Plf. The other $300,000.00 is to be retained in an interest bearing acct. pending resolution of any appeal. The pending request for attny's fees shall have the same effect, under FRAP 54(a)(4), as a timely motion under Rule 59, FRCP, as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/5/10. (tot)
March 9, 2010 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Dft's 151 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law as to Attny's Fees, Dft's 152 Motion to Alter, Amend or Vacate Judgment Regarding Attny's Fees, & Dft's 154 Motion to Vacate Award of Punitive Damages as set out. Dft's 166 Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment is MOOT as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/9/10. (tot)
February 5, 2010 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Dft's 167 Motion to Deposit Funds & orders that the sum of $400,000.00 be invested into the court approved interest-bearing account at the time said funds are delivered to the clerk as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/5/10. (tot)
December 14, 2009 150 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Thomas C. Weller, Jr against Van P. Finger. Compensatory damages awarded in the amount of $100,000.00. Punitive damages awarded in the amount of $300,000.00. Costs are taxed against the defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/14/2009. (mab)
December 7, 2009 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff's 106 Motion in Limine to exclude evidence concerning a Rotary Club fishing trip; and granting defendant's 100 Motion in Limine to exclude evidence concerning the condition of a company truck which defendant returned to plaintiff's company. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/7/2009. (mab)
July 30, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plf's 80 Motion for Trial Setting During First or Second Week of December 2009. Trial set for 12/9/09 as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/30/09. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weller v. Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas C. Weller, Jr.
Represented By: Anne Laurie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van R. Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?