Jackson v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Michael S. Jackson
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2008cv00254
Filed: May 13, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: W. B. Hand
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 31 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Michael S. Jackson stating that petitioner receive as an attorney's fee for services rendered in this Court the sum of $12,929.48 pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(b). Upon receipt of this award, petitioner is to refund to plaintiff the smaller EAJA attorney-fee award paid in this case. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/8/10. Copies to parties. (sdb)
April 6, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that Plf be awarded an attny's fees in the amount of $3,697.70 under EAJA as set out & court costs of $350.00 for a total EAJA award of $4,047.70. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/6/09. (tot) Modified on 4/7/2009 (tot).
March 20, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 25 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Michael S. Jackson. Plaintiff should receive a reasonable attorney's fee in the amount of $3,697.70 under the EAJA for legal services rendered by his attorney in this Court and court costs of $350.00, for a total EAJA award of $4,047.70. Objections to R&R due by 4/3/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 03/20/2009. (mab)
December 31, 2008 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security denying Plf benefits be reversed & remanded as set out for further proceedings not inconsistent w/this decision. The remand pursuant to sentence four makes Plf a prevailing party for purposes of EAJA & terminates this Court's jurisdiction over this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/31/08. (tot)
December 10, 2008 22 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that this cause be reversed & remanded pursuant to sentence four of Sec. 405(g) for further proceedings as set out. Oral argument, presently scheduled for 1/27/09, is CANCELED. Objections to R&R due by 12/24/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 12/10/08. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S. Jackson
Represented By: Byron A. Lassiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?