Knight v. Lane et al

Plaintiff: Darwin Knight
Defendant: Officer Lane, Richard Allen, Grantt Culliver and Alabama Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2008cv00301
Filed: August 19, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Prison Condition Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 28 and denying 26 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/13/10.(copy to Appellant, e-mailed USCA) (jal)
February 17, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Grantt Culliver, Richard Allen, Officer Lane, Alabama Department of Corrections, recommending the motion be granted and that Plaintiff's action against these Defendants be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/12/2010. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
January 25, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Grantt Culliver, Richard Allen, Officer Lane, Alabama Department of Corrections, recommending the motion be granted and that Plaintiff's action against these Defendants be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 2/17/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 1/25/2010. (copy to plaintiff) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight v. Lane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darwin Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grantt Culliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?