Bolton v. WJV Mississippi, Inc.

Plaintiff: Dudley Bolton
Defendant: WJV Mississippi, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv00310
Filed: June 5, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: W. B. Hand
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2011 103 Opinion or Order of the Court Order ruling on the balance of the 88 Motion in Limine regarding medical bills of the remaining providers (as set out). Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/14/2011. (tgw)
February 7, 2011 100 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 88 MOTION in Limine filed by WJV Mississippi, Inc. The motion consists of 14 motions in limine. The motions are granted and denied as set out. The defendant is ordered by 2/11/2011 to file a statement regarding medical bills as set out. The 98 MOTION for Leave to File Reply is granted. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/7/2011. (tgw)
January 20, 2011 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 77 Motion to exclude certain testimony of Dr. Graham. The defendant is precluded from offering testimony from Dr. Graham to establish that Dr. Setzler committed medical malpractice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/20/2011. (tgw)
December 30, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 75 Motion to Alter, Amend or Vacate and to Reconsider. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/30/2010. (tgw)
December 15, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion for Summary Judgment as set out - the defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted as to Count Two and denied as to Count One. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/15/10. Copies to parties on 12/16/10. (mpp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bolton v. WJV Mississippi, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dudley Bolton
Represented By: Kasie M. Braswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WJV Mississippi, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?