Cooper v. Ferrell et al

Plaintiff: Henry Cooper
Defendant: Jerry Ferrell and Walter Myers
Case Number: 1:2008cv00321
Filed: June 6, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that Plf's Complaint is DISMISSED w/prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/4/10. (copy mailed to Plf on 2/5/10) (tot)
January 8, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Dfts' MOTION for Summary Judgment be granted, that this action be dismissed w/prejudice, & that judgment be entered in favor of Dfts & against Plf on all claims. Objections to R&R due by 1/28/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 1/8/10. (copy mailed to Plf on 1/11/10) (tot)
August 27, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 17 Report and Recommendation. Plf's 12 Motion to Amend is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/27/09. (copy mailed to Plf on 8/28/09) (tot)
July 28, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, recommending that 12 MOTION to Amend 1 Complaint filed by Henry Cooper be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 8/17/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 07/28/2009. (copy to pltf 7/28/09) (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Ferrell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?