Alabama Department of Conservation et al v. Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Co., LP et al

Plaintiff: Alabama Department of Conservation, Marine Resources Division, Silver Ships, Inc and National Liability & Fire Insurance Co.
Defendant: Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Co., LP and W & O Supply, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv00326
Filed: June 10, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2009 147 Opinion or Order of the Court Order entered that the court finds that diversity jurisdiction exists in this action. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/9/09. (cmj)
May 27, 2009 128 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 127 Response. National Liability is to file a reply to Warren Alloy LP's objection on or before 6/3/09 and to file the corporate disclosure ( Responses due by 6/3/2009). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/27/09. (cmj)
April 20, 2009 105 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 95 MOTION to Compel Warren Alloy to respond to discovery filed by National Liability & Fire Insurance Co., Silver Ships, Inc, Alabama Department of Conservation, Marine Resources Division. Defendant is ordered to provide respo nses, to the extent it has not done so already, as set out. Plaintiffs ae to file fee petition detailing their reasonable expenses and attorney fees by 4/24/09. Defendant may file objections by 5/1/09. ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 4/24/2009., Miscellaneous deadline set for 5/1/2009.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 4/20/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alabama Department of Conservation et al v. Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Co., LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama Department of Conservation
Represented By: Thomas Marriott Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marine Resources Division
Represented By: Thomas Marriott Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silver Ships, Inc
Represented By: Thomas Marriott Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Liability & Fire Insurance Co.
Represented By: Thomas Marriott Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Co., LP
Represented By: J. Ritchie Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W & O Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?