Sutter v. Eastern Metal Supply, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Luther Sutter
Defendant: Eastern Metal Supply, Inc. and Mark Stallworth
Case Number: 1:2008cv00363
Filed: June 23, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court Order setting an Evidentiary Hearing on damages for 5/27/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Judge William H. Steele. Mr. Sutter may avoid appearing for the scheduled evidentiary hearing by filing detailed written materials (i.e., affidavits, declarations, and exhibits to same) that comply in all material respects with the items set out by 5/20/2009. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 4/28/09. Copy mailed to Mark Stallworth as directed. (tgw)
March 31, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court Order directing the Plaintiff by 4/20/2009 to file written materials that comport with the requirements set out regarding damages against Stallworth or file a notice explaining why he requires an evidentiary hearing in order to establish his damages. Plaintiff is ordered to serve a copy of his response on Stallworth. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 3/31/09. (tgw)
December 1, 2008 27 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting the 24 Motion for Default filed by Luther Sutter. DEFAULT is hereby entered against defendant Mark Stallworth based on his failure to plead or otherwise defend. Upon the conclusion of the litigation between Sutter and Eastern Metal, the Court will take up the propriety of entry of default judgment against Stallworth upon proper application by plaintiff. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 12/1/08. Copy mailed to Stallworth at address set out in the order. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutter v. Eastern Metal Supply, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luther Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Metal Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Stallworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?