Frankum v. Chapman et al

Plaintiff: Herbert Frankum
Defendant: Renetta Chapman, Joe Hunt, Bobby Moore, Richard Allen and Linda Pugh
Case Number: 1:2008cv00373
Filed: June 30, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2012 78 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that this action is DISMISSED w/o prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee & for failure to comply w/the order of this court. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/28/2012. (copy mailed to Plf on 8/30/12) (tot)
August 28, 2012 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 76 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as set out. This action is DISMISSED w/o prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee and for failure to comply with the order of this court. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/28/2012. (copy mailed to Plf on 8/30/12) (tot)
July 2, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 41 and 46 Notice of Change of Address filed by Herbert Frankum. Plf is no longer incarcerated. Plf is obligated to the pay the entire $350.00 filing fee in this action. Plf is ORDERED to supplement his motion to proceed without prepayment of fees by 7/23/2012, as further set out. In the alternative, he may submit the entire remainder of the filing fee of $330.32 by 7/23/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/2/2012. Copy mailed. (sdb)
October 21, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 58 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, denying plaintiff's 51 MOTION for Default Judgment; granting defendant Pugh's 54 MOTION to Set Aside Default; and referring matter to Magistrate for entry of a scheduling order. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/21/2011. (copy to pltf) (mab)
April 24, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - the 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Richard Allen is GRANTED & Plf's claims against Defendant Richard Allen are DISMISSED w/o prejudice. This action will proceed against the other Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/24/09. Copies to parties on 4/27/09. (mpp)
March 31, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Richard Allen be GRANTED & that Plf's claims against this Dft be DISMISSED w/o prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 4/20/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. on 3/31/09. (copy mailed to Plf on 4/2/09) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frankum v. Chapman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Frankum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renetta Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?