Smith v. Disposall, Inc.

Case Number: 1:2008cv00383
Filed: July 2, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Disposall, Inc. against Felicia Smith. All plaintiff's claims against the defendant are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Costs are to be taxed against the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 03/30/2010. (mab)
July 20, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 37 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as the opinion of this court, and DENYING the Defendant's 17 Corrected MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative, MOTION for Transfer of Venue by Disposall, Inc. Answer due from Disposall, Inc. on or before 8/3/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 07/20/2009. (mab)
May 18, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, recommending that the 17 Corrected MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Disposall, Inc. be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 6/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 05/18/2009. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Disposall, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?