Leggett v. Massey et al

Plaintiff: Janet Lanise Leggett
Defendant: United States of America and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2008cv00401
Filed: July 10, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Motor Vehicle Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 51 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 28 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Clarke County, AL, 39 MOTION to Strike and 27 MOTION to Vacate. For the reasons set out, it is recommended that the County's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 28) be GR ANTED and that Plaintiffs claims against the County be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The logical import of this recommendation is that the County's Motion to Reconsider/Vacate (Doc. 27) and the United States Motion to Strike (Doc. 39) are rendered MOOT. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/9/09. (cmj)
May 20, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 28 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Clarke County, AL, 39 MOTION to Strike and 27 MOTION to Vacate. For the reasons set out, it is recommended that the Countys Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 28) be GRANTED and that Plaintiffs claims against the County be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The logical import of this recommendation is that the Countys Motion to Reconsider/Vacate (Doc. 27) and the United States Motion to Strike (Doc. 39) are rendered MOOT. Objections to R&R due by 6/4/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/20/09. (cmj)
March 4, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS WITH CHANGES AS SET OUT IN THIS ORDER re 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, recommending the motion be granted and that plaintiff's claims against State Farm be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/3/09. (cmj)
January 15, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, recommending the motion be granted and that plaintiff's claims against State Farm be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 1/30/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 1/15/09. (cmj)
January 5, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Join Necessary Party Defendant is GRANTED to the extent that Clarke County, Alabama, is hereby added to this litigation as a party defendant under Fed.R.Civ.P. 19(a), but otherwise DENIED. Clarke County shall answer Plaintiffs complaint within twenty (20) days of service. The United States, as the moving party, shall be responsible for serving Clarke County, Alabama with a copy of this Order and a copy of the Plaintiffs complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 1/5/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leggett v. Massey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Lanise Leggett
Represented By: Joseph C. McCorquodale, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Gary A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark R. Ulmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?