David's Auto Shredding, Inc. v. The Shredder Company, LLC et al

Plaintiff: David's Auto Shredding, Inc.
Defendant: The Shredder Company, LLC and Alton Scott Newell, II
Case Number: 1:2008cv00410
Filed: July 15, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 28 Report and Recommendation and 51 Objection. The Report and Recommendation is adopted. The motions to dismiss filed by defendants the Shredder Company, LLC and Alfred Scott Newell II are denied, their alternative motions to transfer are granted and this action is transferred to the U. S. District Court for the Western District of Texas, El Paso Division. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/14/2011. (cmj)
September 12, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying 43 MOTION to Transfer to Bankruptcy Court filed by David's Auto Shredding, Inc.. Objections to 28 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS due by 9/23/2011. Replies due by 10/7/2011. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/12/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
July 1, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 41 Status Report filed by David's Auto Shredding, Inc.. The stay of this action shall continue in effect until Monday, July 11, 2011. In the event that this action is not transferred to the Bankruptcy Court, the parties are ordered to meet and file, by 8/17/201, a report of parties planning meeting. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/1/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David's Auto Shredding, Inc. v. The Shredder Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David's Auto Shredding, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah B. Hembree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Shredder Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alton Scott Newell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?