Trotter v. Marriott Hotel et al

Plaintiff: Andre Trotter
Defendant: Marriott Hotel, Columbia Sussex, Mark Larkin and Suzanne Sapp
Case Number: 1:2008cv00412
Filed: July 15, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Accomodations Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Public Accomodations)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2010 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 158 Supplemental Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/8/10. (tgw)
January 29, 2010 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 147 Motion for Attorney Fees as set out. The plaintiff's motion for award of attorneys' fees, costs and expenses is granted. Mr. Brewster is awarded attorney's fees in the amount of $81,270 and expenses in the amount of $6,159.24. Mr. Mackey is awarded attorney's fees in the amount of $16,525 and expenses in the amount of $2,506.52. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 1/29/2010. Copies to parties. (mpp)
September 28, 2009 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 85 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 87 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 89 Motion for Summary Judgment; the defendants' motions f or summary judgment are granted with respect to the plaintiffs' claims for outrage and negligent or wanton training and supervision. In all other respects, the motions are denied. Granting 104 Motion to Supplement; granting 106 Motion to Su pplement; granting in part and denying in part 109 Motion to Supplement; finding as moot 112 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 113 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 114 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 115 Motion to Strike ; granting 117 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 9/28/09. (mbp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trotter v. Marriott Hotel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Trotter
Represented By: Henry Brewster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Sussex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Sapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?