Joiner et al v. Bayrock Mortgage Corporation

Plaintiff: Frederick Joiner and Eleanor Joiner
Defendant: Bayrock Mortgage Corporation, 1st Continental Mortgage, Inc. and Pleska & Douglas, LLC
Case Number: 1:2008cv00429
Filed: July 22, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Consumer Credit Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1601 Truth in Lending

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered in favor of Eleanor Joiner, Frederick Joiner against 1st Continental Mortgage, Inc., and Bayrock Mortgage Corporation in the amount of $42,412.50, and against Pleska & Douglas, LLC in the amount of $4,735.50. The c ourt finds that the plaintiffs are entitled to recover attorney fees. Plaintiffs' application for costs and fees due within 10 days of the date of this order. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 04/07/2009. (copies to defts at addresses provided on pleadings.) (mab)
March 23, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 34 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the magistrate judge as the opinion of this court. Default is hereby entered against Bayrock Mortgage Corporation and Pleska & Douglas, LLC for failure to comply with the orders of this court. The plaintiffs are ORDERED to file a proposed default judgment as to all defendants on or before April 6, 2009. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 03/23/2009. (mab)
March 5, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, recommending that default be entered against Bayrock Mortgage Corporation and Pleska & Douglas, LLC. Objections to R&R due by 3/19/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 03/05/2009. (mab) Courtesy copy to Atty Kepner 3/6/2009 (mab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joiner et al v. Bayrock Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Joiner
Represented By: Earl P. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor Joiner
Represented By: Earl P. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayrock Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1st Continental Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pleska & Douglas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?