Williams v. Taylor et al

Plaintiff: Darrell Williams
Defendant: Benjamin Taylor, John Morgan, Cliff Gilheart, Mike Cummerlander, Tim Kant, Gloria Banks, Philip Kousa and Thomas Hospital/Mobile Infirmary
Case Number: 1:2008cv00433
Filed: July 24, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Prison Condition Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 1, 2011 155 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that the Plaintiff's federal claims (Doc. 132 , Counts One through Five, Eleven, Eighteen and Twenty) are DISMISSED with prejudice; and that the Plaintiff's state law claims (Doc. 132 , Counts Six through Ten, Twelve through Seventeen, Nineteen and Twenty-One through Twenty-Nine) are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/1/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
June 14, 2011 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 131 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the 84 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Darrell Williams be DENIED & the 106 MOTION to Amend Complaint be GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as set out. The Clerk is DIRECTED to attempt servi ce of process, including copies of the pending complaint and amended complaint upon defendant Mobile Infirmary Health Care Systems d/b/a Thomas Hospital at the address provided by plaintiff. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/14/2011. copy mailed to plaintiff (srr)
June 15, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 25 MOTION to Amend to add Jury Demand filed by Darrell Williams, 24 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Darrell Williams. It is ORDERED that pltf's motion to amend is DENIED and that the motion to amend to add jury demand is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/15/2010. copy of order mailed to pltf (mca)
May 19, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 19 Amended Complaint filed by Darrell Williams, recommending Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Kousa be dismissed without prejudice, prior to service, for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The claims against Defendants Banks, Doe, Taylor, Morgan, Gilheart, Cummerlander and Kant will proceed. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/18/2010. (copy to plaintiff) (cmj)
February 19, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered that plaintiff's application for temporary restraining order or in the alternative motion for preliminary injunction be denied.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/19/09. (copy to plaintiff) (cmj)
January 21, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Darrell Williams, recommending that the motion be denied as set out. Objections to R&R due by 2/16/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/21/09. (copy to plaintiff) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cliff Gilheart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Cummerlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Kant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Kousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Hospital/Mobile Infirmary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?