In Re: In the Matter of the Complaint of Peter Knudsen A/S

Plaintiff: In the Matter of the Complaint of Peter Knudsen A/S
Case Number: 1:2008cv00505
Filed: August 28, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Marine-Exoneration from/or Limitation of Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2010 175 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED as follows: (1) It is hereby declared that, as a matter of law and at all times relevant to the injury sustained by Mr. Emil Harris while onboard the M/V VINLAND SAGA in Mobile, Alabama, on o r about September 28, 2006, Harrison Brothers Drydock & Repair Yard, Inc. was the employer of Mr. Emil Harris within the scope and meaning of the Longshore and Harbor Workers' Compensation Act (LHWCA), 33 U.S.C. Section 901, et seq.; and is ther efore entitled to the statutory immunity provided by said LHWCA to Emil Harris employer against any and allclaims arising out of said injury to Emil Harris; (2) A Final Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Harrison Brothers Drydock & Repair Yard, I nc., and against Peter Knudsen A/S as to Peter Knudsen A/S' counterclaim (Doc. 20 ) against Harrison Brothers Drydock & Repair Yard, Inc.; and (3) A Final Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Harrison Brothers Drydock & Repair Yard, Inc., and against J. Gregory Carwie, Esq., as Conservator for Emil Harris, on Harrison Brothers Drydock & Repair Yard, Inc.'s crossclaim (Doc. 45 ) against J. Gregory Carwie, Esq., as Conservator for Emil Harris. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 05/20/2010. (mab)
May 17, 2010 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Knudsen's 158 Motion to Strike Expert Testimony of Geoffrey Webster & 159 Motion to Strike Expert Testimony of Catherine Brock as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/17/10. (tot)
April 28, 2010 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Harrison Brothers' 54 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Carwie's 134 Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting in part and denying in part Knudsen's 136 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 04/28/2010. (mab)
November 24, 2009 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 106 Motion to Compel Discovery; and denying 107 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/23/2009. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: In the Matter of the Complaint of Peter Knudsen A/S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: In the Matter of the Complaint of Peter Knudsen A/S
Represented By: John P. Kavanagh, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?