McRevy et al v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Stephanie McRevy and Samantha Mulkey
Defendant: Stephen Blake Ryan and Brickwork Investment Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv00508
Filed: August 29, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Motor Vehicle Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Butler
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2010 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Plfs' 95 Motion to Retax Costs. Costs of depositions as set out in the amount of $2,366.75 are taxed against Dft Ryan as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/9/10. (tot)
February 26, 2010 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 87 Motion for new trial and alternative motion for additur. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/26/2010. (mab)
December 22, 2009 84 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, in accordance with the verdict of the jury, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that JUDGMENT is hereby entered in favor of Stephanie McRevy and Samantha Mulkey. Damages are awarded to Stephanie McRevy in the amount of $5,000.00, and damages are awarded to Samantha Mulkey in the amount of $5,000.00. Costs are to be taxed against the defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/22/2009. (mab)
December 18, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 63 Motion for judicial notice of life expectancy. The court will take up the other motions in limine immediately prior to trial. The motion for a hearing (Doc. 77 ) is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/18/2009. (mab)
December 4, 2009 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Any Evidence Relating to Samantha Mulkey's Treatment for Fibromyalgia. Further, all evidence related to Dr. Eversmeyer's treatment and diagnosis of fibromyalgia is excluded, including medical bills and claimed damages resulting from plaintiff Mulkeys claim that she suffers from fibromyalgia. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/04/2009. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McRevy et al v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie McRevy
Represented By: Stephen Wright Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Mulkey
Represented By: Stephen Wright Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Blake Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brickwork Investment Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?