Lucas et al v. Springhill Hospitals, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: David G. Lucas and Betty C. Lucas
Defendant: Springhill Hospitals, Inc., Cardio-Thoracic and Vascular Surgical Associates, P.C., Cardiology Associates of Mobile, Inc., Terry Chris Stelly, John E. Stone, Jr., Kenneth Edward Francez, Jr., Baxter International, Inc., Baxter Healthcare, Scientific Protein Laboratories, American Capital Strategies, Inc. and Techpool Biopharma, Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2008cv00520
Filed: September 9, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Dfts' 19 Motion for Reconsideration, 21 Motion for Reconsideration as set out, & this case remains STAYED. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/22/09. (tot) Modified on 1/22/2009 (tot).
October 28, 2008 38 Opinion or Order of the Court Order STRIKING 37 Third Amended Complaint from the record as set out. The Clerk is directed to annotate the docket accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/28/08. (tot)
September 19, 2008 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion to Stay as set out. This action is STAYED pending receipt of the MDL Panel's transfer order, & the stay will remain in effect until the court is notified of the MDL's Panel's decision concerning transfer. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/19/08. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucas et al v. Springhill Hospitals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David G. Lucas
Represented By: Joseph A. Zarzaur, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty C. Lucas
Represented By: Joseph A. Zarzaur, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springhill Hospitals, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Daniel Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardio-Thoracic and Vascular Surgical Associates, P.C.
Represented By: Michael E. Upchurch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardiology Associates of Mobile, Inc.
Represented By: Norman E. Waldrop, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Chris Stelly
Represented By: Michael E. Upchurch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Stone, Jr.
Represented By: Michael E. Upchurch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Edward Francez, Jr.
Represented By: Norman E. Waldrop, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxter International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxter Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scientific Protein Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Capital Strategies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techpool Biopharma, Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?