Moore v. Ferrell

Plaintiff: Charles Calvin Moore
Defendant: Jerry Ferrell
Case Number: 1:2008cv00533
Filed: September 18, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Prison Condition Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 39 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (INSTRUCTION TO ADOC AND BUSINESS MANAGER OF APPELLANT'S PRISON) 34 the Denial of MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis (with Prisoner Account Statement attached) 35 the denial of MOTION f or Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Charles Calvin Moore. Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/21/09. (jal) (Clerk has mailed to Business Manager of Fountain in Atmore, and Richard Allen Commissioner, ADOC, 301 S. Ripley St., Montgomery, AL, as instructed with copies of the R&R and Judgment).
August 11, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 34 to Deny the MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Charles Calvin Moore. (INSTRUCTION TO ADOC AND BUSINESS MANAGER OF APPELLANT'S PRISON) Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 8/11/09. (jal)
June 3, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/2/09. (copy to Plaintiff) (cmj)
May 19, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jerry Ferrell be granted and that plaintiff's action against this defendant be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 6/8/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 5/19/09. copy to plaintiff (srr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Calvin Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?