American Family Home Insurance Company v. Hillery et al
Plaintiff: Tyrone Hillery and Sheila Jones
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2008cv00547
Filed: July 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
Presiding Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying 68 Motion to Alter, Vacate or Amend Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/11/10. (tgw)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 JUDGMENT stating that this action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/2/10. Copies to parties. (mpp)
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 35 Motion to Consolidate. Lead Case No.: 08-547-WS-C, Member Case No.: 09-22-WS-N, All future pleadings to be filed in the Lead Case. The Clerk is directed to extract documents 1-19 from Civil Action No. 09-22 and to make those documents a part of the court file in Civil Action No. 08-547. The Pretrial Conference is RESET for 4/20/10 at 9:30 a.m.. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 7/20/09. (tgw) Modified on 7/20/2009 (tgw).
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER stating the Clerk's Entry of Default 7 is set aside pursuant to Rule55(c), Fed.R.Civ.P. and the Plaintiff's Motion 6 for Default Judgment is DENIED. AFHIC is ordered to file its answer to the Counterclaim by no later than February 25, 2009. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 2/5/09. Copies to parties on 2/6/09. (mpp)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order stating the defendants are ordered, nlt 1/30/09, to supplement the record with affidavits, exhibits and authority, as appropriate. Plaintiff may file a response to defendants' Rule 55(c) submission nlt 2/6/09. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 1/23/09. Copies to parties. (mpp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Family Home Insurance Company v. Hillery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Thomas E. Bazemore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Hillery
Represented By: Thomas Blake Liveoak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Jones
Represented By: Thomas Blake Liveoak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?