Johnson v. The City of Prichard et al

Plaintiff: Myrtice Johnson
Defendant: The City of Prichard, Ron Davis and The Prichard City Council
Case Number: 1:2008cv00572
Filed: October 1, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Dfts The City of Prichard, Lawrence Battiste, Malachi Jones, Maxine Radcliffe, Ron Davis & against Plf Myrtice Johnson as set out. Plf's claims are DISMISSED W/PREJUDICE as set out. Costs are taxed against Plf. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/28/11. (tot)
February 22, 2011 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 69 motion for certification of an immediate appeal. The case remains set for jury selection on March 1, 2011. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/22/2011. (mab)
February 11, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' 49 Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying plaintiff's 53 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED on all plaintiff's claims excepts plaintiff's claim for trespass based on defendants' use of her property as a parking lot. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/11/2011. (mab)
October 29, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING action as set out, & the Clerk is directed to place this case on the court's administrative docket. The parties shall notify the court w/i 30 days of the resolution of bankruptcy proceedings or of a lift of the stay, & this action will be reinstated to the court's active docket. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/29/09. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. The City of Prichard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrtice Johnson
Represented By: Sonya A. Ogletree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Prichard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prichard City Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?