Akzo Nobel Coatings, Inc. v. Johnston Paint & Body Supplies, LLC

Plaintiff: Akzo Nobel Coatings, Inc.
Defendant: Johnston Paint & Body Supplies, LLC
Case Number: 1:2008cv00578
Filed: October 3, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2011 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plf's 161 Motion to Order Payment of Funds to Court Clerk as set out. Garnishees Regions Bank, RBC Bank (USA) & Wachovia Bank, N.A. are to pay any funds as set out into the registry of the court. The clerk is directed to mail copies of this order to Garnishees at their addresses of record. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/16/2011. (copies mailed to Regions, RBC & Wachovia on 2/17/11) (tot)
December 8, 2010 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plf's 83 Motion for Charging Order as set out. Jody Plezent Johnston, individually, is charged w/payment & satisfaction of the judgment in this matter in the amount of $136,518.61, plus post-judgment interest as set out, & the individual interest of Jody Plezent Johnston in Jody Johnston Enterprises, LLC, is charged w/payment & satisfaction of the judgment plus interest to the extent of the net value of the Beltline property transferred to it by Johnston Painy & Body Supplies, LLC in 2007. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/8/10. (tot)
May 11, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court Order GRANTING Plf's 76 MOTION to Compel Judgment Debtor's Appearance Before Court for Oral Examination Regarding Its Assets. Dft is to respond in full to Plf's 3/10/10 post-judgment discovery requests as set out NLT 6/1/10. Upon f ailure or refusal to fully & completely respond to those requests, Dft is to appear w/counsel on 6/3/2010 at 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2B, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Judge Callie V. S. Granade, for oral examination as set out. Plf is to advise the court NLT 6/2/2010 whether oral examination will be necessary. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/11/10. (tot)
April 16, 2010 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff's 71 request that the court determine the amount of pre-judgment interest and costs, and declaring that plaintiff, Akzo Nobel Coatings Inc., is entitled to $28,403.05 in pre-judgment interest. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 04/16/2010. (mab)
November 5, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that judgment is entered in favor of plaintiff, Akzo Nobel Coatings Inc., and against Johnston Paint & Body Supplies, LLC in the amount of $107,518.77 plus interest and costs. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/05/2009. (mab)
August 31, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Dft's 42 Motion for Leave to File Counterclaim as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/31/09. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akzo Nobel Coatings, Inc. v. Johnston Paint & Body Supplies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akzo Nobel Coatings, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Guidry Hornsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnston Paint & Body Supplies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?