Lovelace v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Linda F. Lovelace
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2008cv00595
Filed: October 9, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that Plf's Motion for Attorney Fees be GRANTED, & that Plf is entitled to receive from Dft a reasaonble attny's fee in the amount of $2,128.10 under EAJA for legal services rendered by her attny in this Court. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/2/09. (tot)
August 17, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 22 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Linda F. Lovelace. The Magistrate Judge recommends that Plaintiff be awarded attorney's fees in the amount of $2,128.10 under the Equ al Access to Justice Act, representing compensation for the 12.75 hours of service by Brian R. Carmichael at the cost-of-living-adjusted rate of $166.91 per hour. Objections to R&R due by 8/31/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 08/17/2009. (mab)
May 6, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, In accordance with the order entered on this date, it is hereby ORDERED,ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security denying plaintiff benefits be reversed and remanded pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 05/06/2009. (mab)
April 21, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that this cause be reversed & remanded for further proceedings as set out, & the remand pursuant to sentence four of §405(g) makes plf a prevailing party for purposes of EAJA & terminates this Court's jurisdiction over this matter. Oral argument scheduled for 5/6/09 is CANCELED. Objections to R&R due by 5/5/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/21/09. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lovelace v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda F. Lovelace
Represented By: Brian Roy Carmichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?