Wilks et al v. American General Life Insurance Comany et al

Plaintiff: John Wilks and Michael Wilks
Defendant: American General Life Insurance Comany, Mark C. Callahan, Lalat Pattanaik, Brady Richardson, J. Michael Mangawang and Frederick A. Romero
Case Number: 1:2008cv00638
Filed: October 30, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 43 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as the opinion of this court. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand be GRANTED and that this actionbe REMANDED to the Mobile County Circuit Court for all further proceedings.Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 07/24/2009. (mab)
June 3, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Plfs' 18 MOTION to Remand be GRANTED as set out. Objections to R&R due by 6/17/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 6/3/09. (tot)
November 10, 2008 14 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by American General Life Insurance Company. Plfs' response due by 11/25/2008. Dft's reply due by 12/3/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/10/08. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilks et al v. American General Life Insurance Comany et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wilks
Represented By: James G. Curenton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wilks
Represented By: James G. Curenton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American General Life Insurance Comany
Represented By: Bonnie Branum Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark C. Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lalat Pattanaik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brady Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Michael Mangawang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick A. Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?