Cotrell et al v. Lovette et al

Plaintiff: Robert Cotrell, Maurice Fitch and Lou Henry McGrew
Defendant: James Lovette and Choctaw County Commission
Case Number: 1:2008cv00646
Filed: November 3, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: Choctaw
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Counter-Dft McGrew's 106 Motion for Reconsideration as set out & awarding attnys' fees in the amount of $17,132.50 to Counter-Plfs Choctaw County Commission & Lovette as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/1/2011. (tot)
June 21, 2010 98 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Counter-Plf Choctaw County Commission against Counter-Dft Lee Henry McGrew in the amount of $20,902.77, plus attnys fees & costs. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/21/10. (copies mailed to Plfs/Counter Dfts Cottrell, Fitch & McGrew on 6/21/10) (tot) Modified on 6/21/2010 (tot).
February 2, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 53 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Choctaw County Commission & 56 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by James Lovette as set out, & judgment will be entered dismissing Plfs' claims. Dft Choctaw County Commission is to file a notice w/the court stating whether it intends to proceed w/its counterclaims on or before 2/9/10. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/2/10. (copies mailed to Plfs on 2/2/10) (tot)
March 2, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Dft Lolley's 19 MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED, & Dft Lolley is DISMISSED from this action. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/2/09. (tot)
February 6, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Dft's 19 MOTION to Dismiss be granted as set out. Since there is no objection to this motion, the District Judge may consider this R&R w/o further delay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 2/6/09. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cotrell et al v. Lovette et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Cotrell
Represented By: Robert Joseph Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Fitch
Represented By: Robert Joseph Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lou Henry McGrew
Represented By: Robert Joseph Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Lovette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choctaw County Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?