Pittinos v. Provident Life and Accident Company et al

Plaintiff: George E. Pittinos
Defendant: Provident Life and Accident Company, UNUM and Tera Wiggins
Case Number: 1:2008cv00662
Filed: November 10, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1145 E.R.I.S.A.

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 23, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 36 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying as unnecessary 34 MOTION to Strike 30 Miscellaneous Document (law review article) Motion to Strike and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Provident Life and Accident Company , UNUM; recommending the proposed amended complaint (doc. 29) be denied as untimely under the pretrial scheduling order as set out. If the recommendation is adopted, this action is due to be closed since there remains nothing of this case that need be decided by the Court. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/22/09. (cmj)
October 30, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying as unnecessary 34 MOTION to Strike 30 Miscellaneous Document (law review article) Motion to Strike and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Provident Life and Accident Company, UNUM; recommending the proposed amended complaint (doc. 29) be denied as untimely under the pretrial scheduling order as set out. If the recommendation is adopted, this action is due to be closed since there remains nothing of this case that need be decided by the Court. Objections to R&R due by 11/16/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/29/09. (cmj)
February 17, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Provident Life and Accident Company, UNUM, 11 MOTION to Remand filed by George E. Pittinos and 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tera Wiggins. The undersigned RECOMMENDS that plaintiffs motion to remand this case to the Circuit Court of Mobile, County (Doc. 11) be DENIED. The motion to dismiss filed by defendants Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company and Unum Group (Doc. 2) should be GRANTED because plaintiffs state-law claims are also defensively preempted. Plaintiff is given leave to re-file any and all exhausted ERISA claims he may have against the remaining defendants.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/13/09. (cmj)
January 21, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Provident Life and Accident Company, UNUM, 11 MOTION to Remand filed by George E. Pittinos and 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tera Wiggins. The undersigned RECOMMENDS that plaintiffs mot ion to remand this case to the Circuit Court of Mobile, County (Doc. 11) be DENIED. The motion to dismiss filed by defendants Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company and Unum Group (Doc. 2) should be GRANTED because plaintiffs state-law claims are also defensively preempted. Objections to R&R due by 2/4/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 1/21/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pittinos v. Provident Life and Accident Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George E. Pittinos
Represented By: Joseph C. Sullivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Life and Accident Company
Represented By: Henry T. Morrissette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM
Represented By: Henry T. Morrissette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tera Wiggins
Represented By: Henry T. Morrissette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?