Regions Bank v. Matter et al

Plaintiff: Regions Bank
Defendant: W. Craig Matter and Jodi Matter
Case Number: 1:2008cv00665
Filed: November 14, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered deft's Motion to Compel is GRANTED 35 . Defendant was ORDERED to produce or make available for inspection all documents in its possession, except those that are privileged, relating to the four loans that are at issue in this act ion and to any loans to BAM Enterprises, LLC, not later than Thursday, October 8, 2009. However, the Court finds that Plaintiffs failure to produce the documents previously does not warrant sanctions and the Motion for Sanctions is DENIED 35 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 9/30/09. (mca)
August 18, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 26 Motion to Strike ; denying 16 Motion for Summary Judgment as set out; terminating 21 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/17/09. (cmj)
May 11, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion to Refer filed by W. Craig Matter, Jodi Matter, recommending that Defendants' motion be denied and that this action be allowed to proceed. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/11/09. (cmj)
April 17, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion to Refer filed by W. Craig Matter, Jodi Matter, recommending that Defendants' motion be denied and that this action be allowed to proceed. Objections to R&R due by 5/1/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 4/16/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regions Bank v. Matter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regions Bank
Represented By: Alan C. Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Craig Matter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodi Matter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?