Trico Marine Assets, Inc. v. Bender Shipbuilding & Repair Co., Inc.

Plaintiff: Trico Marine Assets, Inc.
Defendant: Bender Shipbuilding & Repair Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv00710
Filed: December 9, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Negotiable Instrument Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 62 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bender Shipbuilding & Repair Co., Inc., Thomas B. Bender, Jr.; this action is DISMISSED with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs as stipulated; the Clerk is directed to close this file. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/23/2012. (srr)
November 7, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court Order for parties to file a joint status report. ( Status Report due by 12/19/2011.) The Clerk is directed to close this case for statistical purposes only. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/4/2011. (cmj)
June 29, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as set out; denying 24 Motion to Dismiss; granting 25 Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration. The claims relating to the Converteam Letter Agreement are sever ed from the remaining claims and these claims are ordered to arbitration pursuant to the agreement of the parties and that these claims are dismissed. Trico is entitled to summary judgment in its favor as set out. Judgment is entered in favor of Trico and against Bender, Inc. as to said claims in the amount of $$689,013.07. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/29/09. (cmj)
May 15, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Trico's 12 Motion to Amend Complaint and denying Bender, Inc.'s alternative motion for more definite statement. Trico shall file the second amended complaint by 5/22/09.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/14/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trico Marine Assets, Inc. v. Bender Shipbuilding & Repair Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trico Marine Assets, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew C. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bender Shipbuilding & Repair Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?