The Board of Water and Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile v. The Alabama Department of Transportation et al

Plaintiff: The Board of Water and Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile
Defendant: The Alabama Department of Transportation, Duncan Joseph McInnes, Ronnie Poiroux, W.S. Newell, Inc. and W.S. Newell & Son, Inc.
Intervenor: Mobile Baykeepers, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv00718
Filed: December 15, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Environmental Matters Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 33:1319 Clean Water Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting the 76 MOTION to Amend Complaint and Add Additional Parties filed by The Board of Water and Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile. The Board is ordered by 3/15/2010 to file its second amended complaint. The ALDOT defendants' motions to dismiss the Board's original complaint and first amended complaint, (Docs. 44, 59), are denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/9/10. (tgw)
July 20, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court Order GRANTING the 28 MOTION to Amend Complaint in Intervention filed by Mobile Baykeepers, Inc. Baykeeper is ordered by 7/27/2009 to file its first amended complaint in intervention. The 29 Amended Complaint filed w/o leave of Court is STRICKEN. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 7/20/09. (tgw)
June 3, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting the 5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint in Intervention filed by The Alabama Department of Transportation. Mobile Baykeepers, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 6/3/09. (tgw)
March 3, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 3/3/09. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Board of Water and Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile v. The Alabama Department of Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Mobile Baykeepers, Inc.
Represented By: J. Patrick Courtney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Alabama Department of Transportation
Represented By: Kenneth A. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duncan Joseph McInnes
Represented By: Kenneth A. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Poiroux
Represented By: Kenneth A. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.S. Newell, Inc.
Represented By: Cooper C. Thurber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.S. Newell & Son, Inc.
Represented By: Cooper C. Thurber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Water and Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile
Represented By: Frank G. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?