First Financial Bank v. CS Assets, LLC

Defendant: CS Assets, LLC
Petitioner: First Financial Bank
Case Number: 1:2008cv00731
Filed: December 22, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Real Property: Other Office
County: Baldwin
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2010 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 79 Motion for Disbursement of Funds - plaintiff is entitled todisbursement of funds held in the court registry amounting to $3,207,995.65, plus interest; DENYING 88 Motion to Stay as set out & GRANTING 98 Motion for Leave to File Affidavit. If CS Assets desires a Rule 62(d) stay, it must present the Clerk of Court with a supersedeas bond in that amount by no later than August 19, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/5/10. copies to parties & financial section on 8/6/10. (mpp)
April 8, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting the 71 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff is ordered by 4/15/2010 to file an appropriate motion for disbursement of the funds being held in the registry of this Court (as set out). Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/8/10. (tgw)
January 13, 2010 70 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting in part denying in part the 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CS Assets, LLC & the 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by First Financial Bank. The redemption price for Parcels A through E is fixed at $2,733,069.91. Plaintiff's request for imposition of equitable lien is denied. The parties are ordered by 1/27/2010 to file a joint report (as set out). Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 1/13/10. (tgw)
May 4, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of Alabama. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 5/4/09. (tgw)
April 7, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Order GRANTING the 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CS Assets, LLC. Plaintiff's claims for redemption of Parcel F and the Metes and Bounds Parcel are dismissed; provided, however, that by virtue of having pursued this Motion, CS Assets has waived any right it may have had to object to this action as an improper piecemeal redemption. In so ruling, the Court expressly invokes its equitable powers to adjust the rights and equities of the parties. CS Assets is ordered to file an answer to the complaint by 4/20/2009. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 4/6/09. (tgw)
February 17, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion to Intervene. Petitioners not having been allowed to intervene, the Court deems moot their request to stay this action if intervention is permitted. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 2/14/09. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Financial Bank v. CS Assets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: First Financial Bank
Represented By: Charles C. Simpson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CS Assets, LLC
Represented By: George R. Irvine, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?