Kemp v. Mitchem

Petitioner: Bill Kemp
Respondent: Billy Mitchem
Case Number: 1:2008cv00745
Filed: December 31, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Clarke
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 20 to DENY MOTION for Certificate of Appealability iS deeemed to be a Motion for Reconsideration filed by Bill Kemp, AND 19 to DENY MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Bill Kemp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 3/30/01., ref. Judge Steele. (jal) (copy to Appellant)
March 3, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in accordance with the order entered on this date. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this petition be and is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice and that a certificate of appealability be DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/3/10. Copy mailed to Petitioner (tgw)
February 9, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS entered. It is recommended that Petitioner's habeas petition be dismissed as time barred and that judgment be entered in favor of Respondent, Billy Mitchem, and against Petitioner, Bill Kemp. Objections to R&R due by 3/1/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/9/10. Copy mailed to Petitioner (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kemp v. Mitchem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bill Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Billy Mitchem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?