Wachovia Bank, National Association v. James Ray Builders, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Wachovia Bank, National Association
Defendant: James Ray Builders, Inc. and James R. Ray
Case Number: 1:2009cv00006
Filed: January 6, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2011 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 82 Motion for Disbursement of Funds as further set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/28/2011. copies to parties & emailed to Finance. (sdb)
December 8, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Wachovia Bank, National Association & against James Ray Builders, Inc. & James R. Ray, jointly & severally, in the amount of $274,592.97 as of 12/4/09 as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/8/09. (tot)
November 19, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER GRANTING Plf's 41 Motion for Summary Judgment as set out, & judgment will be entered against Dfts, James Ray Builders, Inc. & James R. Ray, in favor of Plf in the amount of $267,001.56 plus pre-judgment interest at the rate of $40.64 per day from 9/11/09 until the date of judgment & any attnys' fees & expenses incurred from 9/11/09 until the date of the judgment. Plf is to file an accounting of interest, fees & costs as set out on or before 12/3/09, so that a final judgment can be entered. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/19/09. (tot) Modified on 11/19/2009 (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wachovia Bank, National Association v. James Ray Builders, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wachovia Bank, National Association
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Ray Builders, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?