Madison v. Allen et al

Petitioner: Vernon Madison
Respondent: Richard Allen, Alabama Department of Corrections and Attorney General of Alabama
Case Number: 1:2009cv00009
Filed: January 7, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Death Penalty)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 55 USCA Order and 56 USCA Mandate. The Court finds that Madison has failed to prove purposeful discrimination or pretext. It is ORDERED that Madison's petition is DENIED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/25/2013. copy mailed to petitioner. (sdb)
August 8, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 59 Motion to Stay as the motion is premature. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/8/2012. (cmj)
July 17, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court Order. State's brief due by 8/3/2012; Petitioner's response due 8/24/12. Evidentiary Hearing set for 9/20/2012 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Judge Kristi K. DuBose. State custodian to produce petitioner for evidentiary hearing. Clerk to prepare writ and provide this order and writ to USM. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/17/2012. (cmj)
April 25, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 Motion for Reconsideration/to Alter or Amend Judgment as set out.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/25/2011. (copy to petitioner) (cmj)
April 20, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: Attorney Furman's motion to withdraw (doc. 43) is granted upon the appearance in this case of counsel from the Equal Justice Initiative on behalf of Madison. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/20/2011. (cmj)
March 21, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Alabama Department of Corrections, Attorney General of Alabama, Richard Allen against Vernon Madison. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/21/2011. Copies to parties. (sdb)
January 28, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 5 Order. In light of Mr. Madisons correspondence (doc. 6) to the court and his clear desire to have counsel other than Mr. McCann appointed, Mr. McCann should include in his response(due 1/30/09) an explanation of why he has requested that the court appoint him as counsel for petitioner.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/27/09. (copy to petitioner) (cmj)
January 16, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Vernon Madison. Mr. McCann is directed to file additional information relevant to the statutory requirements as set out regarding his motion to appoint counsel, no later than 1/30/09. The motion to appear Pro Hac Vice is held in abeyance pending filing of the supplemental information. ( Amended Motion deadline set for 1/30/2009.). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/16/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madison v. Allen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vernon Madison
Represented By: Patrick McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richard Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?