Pugh v. Dix et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Lenard Pugh
Defendant: Richard Dix, Brent Guy, Jana Dukes, Michael Beadnell, Gaillard Ladd, Vincent F. Kilborn, IV, A. Joseph Altadonna, JoJo Schwarzauer and Judge Youngpeter
Case Number: 1:2009cv00016
Filed: January 9, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2012 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 164 Motion for Reconsideration, as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/27/2012. (cmj)
October 20, 2011 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 148 Motion to Alter Judgment as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/18/2011. (copy mailed) (cmj)
September 2, 2011 147 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered dismissing this action with prejudice.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/2/2011. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
August 5, 2011 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REOPENING CASE, granting 139 MOTION to Amend Order of District Judge 138 Judgment filed by Christopher Lenard Pugh. The 137 order and 138 judgment adopting the report and recommendation are VACATED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/4/2011. Copy of order, 128 R&R, and 134 response mailed to plaintiff as directed. (sdb)
July 7, 2011 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 128 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the motion for summary judgment filed by Richard Dix, Brent Guy and Jana Dukes, the defendants, be granted and that the motion for judgment on the pleadings filed by the plaintiff, Christopher Lenard Pugh be denied. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/7/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
June 14, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as to the following Motions: Motion to Amend Complaint 76 granting in part as to damages only, and denying in part as set out; Motion 77 for Reconsideration of appointment of counsel is DENIED; Motion 78 for a physical and mental examination is DENIED; Motion 79 to Continue is DENIED, as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/14/10. Copies to parties. (mpp)
February 23, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 53 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff's motion to amend 30 is denied and plaintiff's motion to amend 52 is granted; all of plaintiff's claims except plaintiff's claims of excessive use of force against defe ndants Dix and Guy and claims of unreasonable search and seizure of property against defendants Dix and Dukes are dismissed without prejudice; and process shall issue upon the remaining claims against Dix, Guy and Dukes. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/23/2010. (copy to plaintiff) (cmj)
January 27, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION entered re 30 MOTION to Amend Complaint and 52 MOTION to Amend/Correct. For the reasons set forth, the undersigned recommends that plaintiff's motion to amend (Doc. 30) be denied, that plaintiffs most recent motion to amend (doc. 52) be granted, and that all portions of this action EXCEPT plaintiffs claims for excessive use of force against defendants Dix and Guy and his claims for unreasonable search and seizure against defendants Dix and Dukes, be dismissed, without prejudice. The undersigned recommends that process issue only on the plaintiffs claims of excessive use of force against defendants Dix and Guy and the claims of unreasonable search and seizure of property against defendants Dix and Dukes and that all other claims be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 2/16/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 1/27/2010. (mca)
February 3, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court Order for plaintiff to file new form 1983 complaint by 3/2/09. ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 3/2/2009.) Plaintiff's motions to amend complaint are denied as set out.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/2/09. (order and 1983 form mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pugh v. Dix et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lenard Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Dix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Guy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jana Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Beadnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaillard Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent F. Kilborn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Joseph Altadonna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JoJo Schwarzauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Youngpeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?