Transmontaigne Product Services, Inc. v. M/V Wilbur R. Clark et al

Plaintiff: Transmontaigne Product Services, Inc.
Defendant: M/V Wilbur R. Clark, Barge 7001 and Hannah Marine Corporation
Case Number: 1:2009cv00023
Filed: January 14, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Marine Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1333 Admiralty

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2010 278 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 275 Motion for Attorney Fees to the extent that Harrison Brothers is awarded a total of $46,153.20 for attorneys' fees and Whistleris awarded a total of $40,928.30 for attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 08/10/2010. (mab)
June 17, 2010 273 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Harrison Brothers Dry Dock & Repair Yard, Inc. against Hannah Marine Corporation in the amount of $131,429.00, and in favor of Whistler Machine Works, Inc. against Hannah Marine Corporation in the amount of $69,081.85, as set out in judgment. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 06/17/2010. (mab)
April 20, 2010 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 261 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as the opinion of this court; granting 209 & 249 Motions for entry of Default; striking Hannah Marine's answers to amended complaint (Docs. 66 & 67 ), and granting Whistler Machine Works, Inc. and Harrison Brothers Dry Dock & Repair Yard, Inc. leave to re-file their respective motions for default judgment. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 04/20/2010. (mab)
March 29, 2010 257 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Century's 242 Motion for Summary Judgment, and directing the clerk of court to disburse the $782,442.75 surety bond to Century Services LP. It is also ORDERED that the parties advise this court, no later than April 12, 2010, what issues that are pending still need to be resolved. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 03/26/2010. (mab)
December 18, 2009 235 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Century Services LP's 212 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/18/2009. (mab)
October 29, 2009 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Confirming The Sale of the Barge Hannah-7701 Nunc Pro Tunc. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/29/2009. (Copy to USM) (mab)
July 9, 2009 160 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: hrg held on 7/9/09 re: Century Services LP's 121 MOTION for Interlocutory Sale of Vessels Pursuant to Rule E(9). The court finds that the motion should be granted & that Century should be allowed to credit bid at the sale as set out , provided that Century posts cash or a surety bond as set out. On or before 7/13/2009, the parties are to file their calculation(s) of the amount for Century's required bond as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/9/09. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transmontaigne Product Services, Inc. v. M/V Wilbur R. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transmontaigne Product Services, Inc.
Represented By: Donald C. Radcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Wilbur R. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barge 7001
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannah Marine Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?