Barna Conshipping, S.L. v. 1,800 Metric Tons, More of Less, of Abandoned Steel

Plaintiff: Barna Conshipping, S.L.
Defendant: 1,800 Metric Tons, More of Less, of Abandoned Steel
Case Number: 1:2009cv00027
Filed: January 15, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Marine Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1333 Admiralty

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 51 Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/4/09. (cmj)
April 29, 2009 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 39 Motion to Dismiss. As set out, the Court finds that the Rule C arrest of the cargo is VACATED. Accordingly, to the extent the Defendants motion (Docs. 39, 40) requests that the warrant of arrest be vacated, the motion is GRANTED. All other relief requested in the motion is MOOT.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/28/09. (cmj)
April 14, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 53 Motion for Writ; denying 56 Amended Second Motion for Writ of Attachment and Garnishment as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/14/09. (cmj)
March 17, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Motion for Writ of Attachment and Garnishment as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/17/09. (cmj)
January 16, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting as set out 5 Motion to Require Offloading of Cargo. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/16/09. (3) certified copies to USM (mca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barna Conshipping, S.L. v. 1,800 Metric Tons, More of Less, of Abandoned Steel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barna Conshipping, S.L.
Represented By: Allen E. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1,800 Metric Tons, More of Less, of Abandoned Steel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?