Oliver v. Cummins

Case Number: 1:2009cv00052
Filed: January 28, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered denying petitioners request for habeas corpus relief pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §2254 and DISMISSING with prejudice because the claims asserted therein are unexhausted and are now precluded from review by the Alabama courts and this Court under the doctrine of procedural default. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/19/09. (copy to petitioner) (cmj)
October 28, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by James Oliver, recommending that the petition be denied and dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 11/23/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/28/09. (copy mailed to petitioner) (cmj)
January 30, 2009 2 Opinion or Order of the Court Order for petitioner to pay the filing fee or file IFP motion. ( Filing Fee or IFP motion due by 3/2/2009.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/29/09. (IFP and this order mailed to petitioner) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?