Muhammad v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A.

Plaintiff: Bernice Muhammad
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00053
Filed: January 29, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered denying 56 Motion for temporary restraining order and/or injunction. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/25/2010. (mca)
September 16, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/15/09. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
September 1, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re MOTION to Dismiss filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A., 41 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Bernice Muhammad, 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bernice Muhammad, 30 MOTION re 25 Order filed by Bernice Muh ammad, 40 MOTION filed by Bernice Muhammad. For reasons set out, it is recommended that plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment (doc. 23) be DENIED; 2) plaintiffs Motion (doc. 30)concerning defendants failure to respond to plaintiffs restructuring proposal (doc. 27) be DENIED; 3) plaintiffs Motion (doc. 33) concerning defendants corporate disclosure be DENIED; 4) plaintiffs Motion to Reiterate (doc. 40) be STRICKEN; 5) plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment (doc. 41) against Merrill Lynch be STRICKEN; 6) defendants Motion to Dismiss (doc. 24) be GRANTED; and 7) plaintiffs complaint be DISMISSED without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 9/16/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/1/09. (copy to plaintiff) (cmj)
February 3, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2 Motion for TRO as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/3/09. (copy mailed to plaintiff and emailed to plaintiff with copy of response) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhammad v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernice Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?