Williams v. Hardesty

Plaintiff: Wendy Williams
Defendant: George Hardesty
Case Number: 1:2009cv00054
Filed: January 30, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Prison Condition Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny, re 25 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Wendy Williams Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/14/09. ref. Judge DuBose. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/19/2009. (Clerk mailed copy to Appellant and e-mailed USCA) (jal)
October 14, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny, re 25 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Wendy Williams Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/14/09. ref. Judge DuBose. (jal) (Clerk mailed copy to Appellant)
August 21, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Wendy Williams 12 Amended Complaint filed by Wendy Williams, recommending that this action be dismissed with prejudice because the claims are either frivolous or fail to state a claim upon which relief can be granted or seek monetary relief against a defendant who is immune from such relief. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/21/09. (adk)
July 14, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Wendy Williams, 12 Amended Complaint filed by Wendy Williams, recommending that this action be dismissed with prejudice because the claims are either frivolous or fail to state a claim upon which relief can be granted or seek monetary relief against a defendant who is immune from such relief. Objections to R&R due by 8/7/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 7/13/09. (copy to plaintiff) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Hardesty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Hardesty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?